Here is another way of multiplication using Vedic mathematics. This is the actual method given in Vedic mathematics. In this tutorial, I’m interested to multiply 32 x 23. Step 1 Make the multiplications of first digit of multiplicand and multiplier. Same thing for second digit. Shown in figure 2.

Step 2 Here we are making sum of multiplication, 3×3 and 2×2. We review the answer 4 and 9. Make the sum of 9+4 = 13. Shown in image 3.

Step 3 Arrange the number given image 4. We received answer 13. The user number 3 and 1 will be added next number as carry.   Finally the answer will become 736. These trick only applicable where multiplicand and multiplier are having 2 digit. For various digit we have another trick by making some modifications in these trick. We will discuss about this later.

Here is another way of multiplication using Vedic mathematics. This is the actual method given in Vedic mathematics. In this tutorial, I’m interested to multiply 32 x 23. Step 1 Make the multiplications of first digit of multiplicand and multiplier. Same thing for second digit. Shown in figure 2.

Step 2 Here we are making sum of multiplication, 3×3 and 2×2. We review the answer 4 and 9. Make the sum of 9+4 = 13. Shown in image 3.

Step 3 Arrange the number given image 4. We received answer 13. The user number 3 and 1 will be added next number as carry.   Finally the answer will become 736. These trick only applicable where multiplicand and multiplier are having 2 digit. For various digit we have another trick by making some modifications in these trick. We will discuss about this later.

Multiplication trick (Vedic Math-II)

Here is another way of multiplication using Vedic mathematics. This is the actual method given in Vedic mathematics. In this tutorial, I’m interested to multiply 32 x 23. Step 1 Make the multiplications of first digit of multiplicand and multiplier. Same thing for second digit. Shown in figure 2.

Step 2 Here we are making sum of multiplication, 3×3 and 2×2. We review the answer 4 and 9. Make the sum of 9+4 = 13. Shown in image 3.

Step 3 Arrange the number given image 4. We received answer 13. The user number 3 and 1 will be added next number as carry.   Finally the answer will become 736. These trick only applicable where multiplicand and multiplier are having 2 digit. For various digit we have another trick by making some modifications in these trick. We will discuss about this later.

Share Post

Here is another way of multiplication using Vedic mathematics. This is the actual method given in Vedic mathematics. In this tutorial, I’m interested to multiply 32 x 23. Step 1 Make the multiplications of first digit of multiplicand and multiplier. Same thing for second digit. Shown in figure 2.

Step 2 Here we are making sum of multiplication, 3×3 and 2×2. We review the answer 4 and 9. Make the sum of 9+4 = 13. Shown in image 3.

Step 3 Arrange the number given image 4. We received answer 13. The user number 3 and 1 will be added next number as carry.   Finally the answer will become 736. These trick only applicable where multiplicand and multiplier are having 2 digit. For various digit we have another trick by making some modifications in these trick. We will discuss about this later.

Here is another way of multiplication using Vedic mathematics. This is the actual method given in Vedic mathematics. In this tutorial, I’m interested to multiply 32 x 23. Step 1 Make the multiplications of first digit of multiplicand and multiplier. Same thing for second digit. Shown in figure 2.

Step 2 Here we are making sum of multiplication, 3×3 and 2×2. We review the answer 4 and 9. Make the sum of 9+4 = 13. Shown in image 3.

Step 3 Arrange the number given image 4. We received answer 13. The user number 3 and 1 will be added next number as carry.   Finally the answer will become 736. These trick only applicable where multiplicand and multiplier are having 2 digit. For various digit we have another trick by making some modifications in these trick. We will discuss about this later.