Fast Multiplication (Vadic Maths-III)

Vedic Multiplication Trick

This method of multiplication from Vedic Maths will make it very easy to multiply two numbers when sum of the last digits is 10 and previous parts are the same. For example multiplications like. This trick applicable only limited number.

23×27: Sum of Unit digits i.e. 3+7 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 2 is same in both numbers

46×44: Sum of Unit digits i.e. 6+4 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 4 is same in both numbers

112×118: Sum of Unit digits i.e. 2+8 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 11 is same in both numbers

291×299: Sum of Unit digits i.e. 1+9 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 29 is same in both numbers

135×135: Sum of Unit digits i.e. 5+5 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 13 is same in both numbers

Solving 46 x 44

You will get the answer in two parts.

First part, to get left hand side of the answer: multiply the left most digit(s), i.e. 4 by its successor 5

Second part, to get right hand side of the answer: multiply the right most digits of both the numbers i.e. 4 and 6.

Example

First part: 4 x (4+1)

Second part: (4 x 6)

Combined effect: (4 x 5) | (4 x 6) = 2024

Share Post